IA HSB116 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF463
Note: Legislation replaced by HF638
Note: Legislation replaced by HF638
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 383.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 383.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to late fees and procedures associated with rental agreements.
Title
A bill for an act relating to late fees and procedures associated with rental agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 383. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-04 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Gustafson and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 206. |
2019-02-04 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1053 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF463 (Replaced by) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1156.
HF638 (Replaced by) 2020-06-12 - Amendment H-8297 filed. H.J. 744.
SF463 (Replaced by) 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1156.
HF638 (Replaced by) 2020-06-12 - Amendment H-8297 filed. H.J. 744.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB116 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB116.html |