IA HSB170 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF300
Note: Legislation replaced by HF595
Note: Legislation replaced by HF595
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 367.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to allowable annual salaries for deputy county auditors in charge of elections administration.
Title
A bill for an act related to allowable annual salaries for deputy county auditors in charge of elections administration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 367. |
2019-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Bacon and Konfrst. H.J. 298. |
2019-02-14 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF300 (Replaced by) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee: Segebart, Guth, and J. Smith. S.J. 380.
HF595 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
HF595 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB170 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB170.html |