IA HSB184 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF477
Note: Legislation replaced by HF644
Note: Legislation replaced by HF644
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to juvenile justice, including provisions relating to child foster care and parent visitation in child in need of assistance proceedings.
Title
A bill for an act relating to juvenile justice, including provisions relating to child foster care and parent visitation in child in need of assistance proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382. |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-19 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Dolecheck and Sunde. H.J. 314. |
2019-02-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1209 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF477 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1051.
HF644 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
SF477 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1051.
HF644 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB184 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB184.html |