IA HSB204 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF772
Note: Legislation replaced by SF625

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 811.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating an empower rural Iowa Act to provide incentives for broadband and workforce housing, and including applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating an empower rural Iowa Act to provide incentives for broadband and workforce housing, and including applicability provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 811.
2019-03-06HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-03-05HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 8:30AM House Lounge.
2019-02-25HouseSubcommittee: Carlson, Osmundson and Gaskill. H.J. 354.
2019-02-25HouseBy COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS

Same As/Similar To

SSB1193 (Related) 2019-03-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF772 (Replaced by) 2019-05-20 - Signed by Governor.
SF625 (Replaced by) 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1093.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback