IA HSB674 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2364
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2572
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2572
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a construction manager-at-risk commercial construction alternative delivery method and prohibiting certain other alternative delivery methods in the public sector.
Title
A bill for an act relating to a construction manager-at-risk commercial construction alternative delivery method and prohibiting certain other alternative delivery methods in the public sector.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 323. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: Upon Adjournment of Local Government committee RM 19. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, Lohse and Hunter. H.J. 253. |
2020-02-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3153 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2364.
SF2364 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Fiscal note.
HF2572 (Replaced by) 2020-06-13 - Amendments H-8307, H-8310 and H-8311 filed. H.J. 766.
SF2364 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Fiscal note.
HF2572 (Replaced by) 2020-06-13 - Amendments H-8307, H-8310 and H-8311 filed. H.J. 766.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB674 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB674.html |