IA HSB733 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2684
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of a medical cannabidiol registration card to a person who is not a resident of Iowa.(See HF 2684.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of a medical cannabidiol registration card to a person who is not a resident of Iowa.(See HF 2684.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2684. |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee report, approving bill. H.J. 714. |
2024-03-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2024 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-03-06 | House | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Forbes and Harris. H.J. 537. |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 535. |
2024-03-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2684 (Replaced by) 2024-04-03 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 717.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB733 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB733.html |