IA SF333 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections. (Formerly SSB 1140.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections. (Formerly SSB 1140.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 949.
2019-04-15SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 949.
2019-04-04SenateMessage from House. S.J. 855.
2019-04-03HouseImmediate message. H.J. 736.
2019-04-03HousePassed House, yeas 99, nays none. H.J. 726.
2019-04-03HouseSubstituted for HF 600. H.J. 726.
2019-03-29HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 693.
2019-03-28HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 689.
2019-03-28SenateImmediate message. S.J. 786.
2019-03-28SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 786.
2019-02-20SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 366.
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 360.

Same As/Similar To

HSB136 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 365.
SSB1140 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF600 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback