IA SSB1014 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF153
Note: Legislation replaced by HF185
Note: Legislation replaced by HF185
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the title of the office of citizens' aide.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the title of the office of citizens' aide.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | Voted - State Government. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | State Government: Dearden Chair,Sodders, and Smith, R.. |
2013-01-15 | Senate | In State Government |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB39 (Related) 2013-02-07 - Voted - State Government.
SF153 (Replaced by) 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
HF185 (Replaced by) 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
SF153 (Replaced by) 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
HF185 (Replaced by) 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS