IL HB0026 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the contents of the introduced bill, but provides that a school district must require (rather than the State Board of Education shall require) that the Internet website or web service comply with Level AA of the World Wide Web Consortium's Web Content Accessibility Guidelines. Adds an effective date of August 1, 2022.
Title
SCH CD-INTERNET ACCESSIBILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0238 |
2021-08-02 | House | Effective Date August 1, 2022 |
2021-08-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-06 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-15 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-02-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |