IL HB1298 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0402
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the State Police Electronic Citation Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be appropriated to the Department of State Police for uses related to electronic citations. Amends the Clerks of Courts Act. Provides that the circuit court clerk shall remit electronic citation fees designated for the Department of State Police to the State Treasurer for deposit into the State Police Electronic Citation Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
ST POLICE CITATION FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0402 |
2011-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2011 |
2011-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2011 |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2011 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Annazette R. Collins |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 7, 2011 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2011-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-02-15 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.786 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 105 | 27.3e | Amended Code | Citation Text |