IL HB1758 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Laborers Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the Laborers' and Retirement Board Employees' Annuity and Benefit Fund to indemnify and protect the trustees, staff, and consultants of the Fund against all damage claims and suits when damages are sought for negligent or wrongful acts alleged to have been committed in the scope of employment or under the direction of the trustees. Provides that the trustees, staff, and consultants shall not be indemnified for wilful misconduct or gross negligence. Authorizes the board to insure against loss or liability of the trustees, staff, and consultants that may result from these damage claims. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 11-INDEMNIFICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 11-212.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |