IL HB2941 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Illinois Department of Corrections, the Cook County Department of Corrections, and the office of the sheriff of every other county to honor all intergovernmental agreements with the Department of Human Services concerning the exchange of inmate information and to provide all required information in a timely manner. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC AID-INMATE INFORMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0115 |
2019-07-22 | House | Effective Date July 22, 2019 |
2019-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-4.7b | Amended Code | Citation Text |