IL HB3502 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Protection and Advocacy for Mentally Ill Persons Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Act's purpose.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0184 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 019-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Re-assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 45 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |