IL HB3624 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Clean Energy Jobs Act. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CLEAN ENERGY JOBS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-09-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-08-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2019-08-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-07-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-07-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-12HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-26HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 018-011-000
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Energy & Environment Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback