IL HB4079 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides a process to register with the Department of Insurance as a pharmacy benefits manager and what information must be included. Provides that the Director of Insurance may revoke, suspend, deny, or restrict a certificate of registration for violation of the Code or on other grounds as determined necessary or appropriate by the Director. Provides that the Department shall regulate the drug pricing process used by pharmacy benefits managers, and specifies the appeals process for such pricing. Provides that pharmacy benefits managers shall not mandate that a covered individual use a specific pharmacy or provide incentives to encourage the use of a specific pharmacy under specified circumstances. Provides criteria for entities to use in performing on-site audits of pharmacy records. Provides that health plans must permit their enrollees to receive benefits, which may include a 90-day supply of covered prescription drugs, at any of its network community pharmacies. Contains provisions concerning medication synchronization. Provides that dispensing fees shall be determined exclusively on the total number of prescriptions dispensed. Regulates how pharmacy benefits managers may utilize personally identifiable data. Provides that the Department can regulate other specified activities of pharmacy benefits managers. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2016.
Title
INS CD-PHARM BENEFITS MANAGER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 512-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 512-11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 512-12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 512-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 512-14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 512-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 512-16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 512-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 512-18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 512-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 512-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 512-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 512-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 512-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 512-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 512-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4079&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4079.htm |