IL HB4190 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Paid Leave for All Workers Act. Changes the effective date of the Act from January 1, 2024 to July 1, 2024. Effective immediately.
Title
PAID LEAVE FOR ALL WORKERS
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2023-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-11-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2023-11-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2023-10-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-10-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2023-10-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-10-25 | House | First Reading |
2023-10-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 192 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4190&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4190.htm |