IL HB4226 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Court Reporters Act. Provides that each court reporter may be required by the chief judge to (rather than shall) take a test to verify his or her proficiency within one year of employment.
Title
CT REPORTER-PROFICIENCY TEST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-11-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-08 | House | First Reading |
2023-11-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 70 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |