IL HB4891 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Provides that a dentist, employee of a dentist, or agent of a dentist may not arrange for, broker, or establish financing extended by a third party for a patient. Provides that a dentist, employee of a dentist, or agent of a dentist may not complete for a patient or patient's guardian any portion of an application for financing extended by a third party. Provides that a dentist, employee of a dentist, or agent of a dentist may not provide the patient or patient's guardian with an electronic device to apply for financing extended by a third party. Provides that a dentist, employee of a dentist, or agent of a dentist may not promote, advertise, or provide marketing or application materials for financing extended by a third party to a patient who (1) has been administered or is under the influence of general anesthesia, conscious sedation, moderate sedation, nitrous oxide; (2) is being administered treatment; or (3) is in a treatment area, including, but not limited to, an exam room, surgical room, or other area when medical treatment is administered, unless an area separated from the treatment area does not exist. Provides that a dentist, employee of a dentist, or agent of a dentist must provide a specific written notice to a patient or patient's guardian when discussing or providing applications for financing extended by a third party. Provides that a violation of the provisions is punishable by a fine of up to $500 for the first violation and a fine of up to $1,000 for each subsequent violation. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may take other disciplinary action if the licensee's conduct also violates other provisions of the Act. Defines terms. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
DENTAL THIRD-PARTY FINANCING
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Croke [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Kevin Olickal [D] |
Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] | Rep. Hoan Huynh [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-035-002 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 008-001-001 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 007-003-001 |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |