IL HB5014 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Building Commission Act. Removes various repeal dates of June 1, 2018 in provisions concerning allowing public building commissions to use the design-build delivery method for public projects. Makes conforming changes.
Title
BLDG COMMISSION-DESIGN-BUILD
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 20 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 23.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5014&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5014.htm |