IL HB5486 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions and State Employees Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that an employee of the Department of Children and Family Services who conducts home visits may establish eligible creditable service under the alternative annuity provisions of the State Employees Article. Provides that an employee of the Department of Children and Family Services who conducts home visits may elect to convert service credit earned under the State Employees Article as an employee of the Department of Children and Family Services who conducts home visits to eligible creditable service under the alternative annuity provisions by filing a written election and making a specified contribution. Provides that any benefit increase that results from the amendatory Act is excluded from the definition of "new benefit increase". Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
PENCD-SERS-ALTERNATIVE ANNUITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5486&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5486.htm |