IL HJR0029 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Department of Transportation to offer at least 3 healthy snacks containing less than 220 calories for every 10 snacks in vending machines in State rest stops and welcome centers, of which a minimum of 2 should be made in Illinois.
Title
REST AREA/WELCOME CTR SNACKS
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] |
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 110-000-000 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-03-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 018-000-000 |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |