IL HJR0086 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Special Commission on Gynecologic Cancers to study the issue of gynecologic cancers in Illinois and determine the best practices for treatment.
Title
GYNECOLOGIC CANCER COMMISSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-02-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-09-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |