IL SB0231 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation.
Title
DISASTER RELIEF-IEMA-GRANTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-04-10 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2105 | 2105-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |