IL SB1204 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Governor's Office of Management and Budget Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning intergovernmental cooperation.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-005-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3005 | 2.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |