IL SB1522 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Deletes a provision that provides that all or specified members of a limited liability company are liable in their capacity as members for all or specified debts, obligations, or liabilities of the company if: (i) a provision to that effect is contained in the articles of organization and (ii) a member so liable has consented in writing to the adoption of the provision or to be bound by the provision. Provides that with respect to imposing liability upon a member because of a member's personal conduct, nothing in the Act shall be deemed to limit the effect of law other than the Act. Provides that a limited liability company's operating agreement may not restrict the duty to act fairly as described in the Act. Provides that the operating agreement may identify the standards by which the obligation to act fairly is measured.
Title
LLC-MEMBER LIABILITY & DUTIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 180 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 15-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1522&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1522.htm |