IL SB1777 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion Act. Provides that neither the State nor any of its subdivisions may authorize the use of, appropriate, or expend funds to pay for an abortion or to cover any part of the costs of a health plan that includes coverage of abortion or to provide or refer for an abortion, unless a woman who suffers from a physical disorder, physical injury, or physical illness that would, as certified by a physician, place the woman in danger of death if an abortion is not performed. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971 and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Excludes from the programs of health benefits and services authorized under those Acts coverage for elective abortions as provided in the No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion Act. Amends the Problem Pregnancy Health Services and Care Act. Permits the Department of Human Services to make grants to nonprofit agencies and organizations that do not use those grants to refer or counsel for, or perform, abortions. Contains provisions regarding applicability and preempts home rule. Effective June 1, 2019.
Title
NO TAXPAYER FUNDING ABORTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 6-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 230 | 4-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1777&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1777.htm |