IL SB2218 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987. Prohibits the dispensing of contact lenses by anyone other than a licensed optometrist, licensed pharmacist, or a physician licensed to practice medicine in all of its branches.
Title
OPTOMETRY-CONTACT LENSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-05 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0186 |
2013-08-05 | Senate | Effective Date August 5, 2013 |
2013-08-05 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-001 |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000 |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Frerichs |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 80 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |