IL SB3174 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0835
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0835
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Allows the administrator to deliver property or pay the amount owing to a person without the person filing a claim if the value of the property that is owed the person is $5,000 (rather than $2,000) or less. Allows the administrator to waive a specific requirement and pay or deliver property directly to a person if the property has a value of less than $2,000 (rather than $500). Allows an heir or agent who files an unclaimed property claim in which the decedent's property does not exceed $250 (rather than $100) to submit an affidavit attesting to the heir's or agent's capacity to claim in lieu of submitting a certified copy of the will to verify a claim. Provides that an affidavit is not required to include a copy of the decedent's death certificate if other evidence of the death of the owner is available. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RUUPA-PROP AMOUNT-AFFIDAVIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0835 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 1026 | 15-503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1026 | 15-904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |