IL SB3549 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1172
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Oil and Gas Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall conduct annual inspections at all gas storage fields in the State to ensure that there are no infrastructure deficiencies or failures that could pose any harm to public health. Provides that the owner of the gas storage field shall cover the costs of the annual inspection.
Title
OIL AND GAS-GAS STORAGE FIELDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1172 |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Effective Date January 4, 2019 |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-11-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 015-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote |
2018-11-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2018-11-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |