IL SB3928 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates the amount of $709,500 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for a grant to the Forest Preserve District of Cook County for the administration and operation of Greencorps Chicago and Forest Preserve Experience programs within the Conservation Corps program. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$DCEO-FOREST PRESERVE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Willie Preston |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3928&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/PDF/10300SB3928.pdf |