IL SR0301 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States that policy decisions enacted by the Illinois State Legislature should acknowledge and take into account the principles of trauma, whenever possible, and consider the concepts of toxic stress, early adversity, and buffering relationships and note the role of early intervention and investment in trauma-informed policies leading to a healing-centered environment. States that Illinois should invest in technological connectivity that includes detailed information and resources on trauma-informed care, standards for providing evidence-based trauma informed treatment, peer to peer networking, and creation of belonging through narrative expression. States that Illinois should move from a siloed, individual approach to a collaborative, person-centered healing approach to identify, strengthen, and empower individuals and communities to craft a future positive history of Illinois.
Title
TRAUMA-INFORMED POLICIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Behavioral and Mental Health; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |