IN HB1370 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 175
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dual credit teachers. Requires the commission for higher education (or the dual credit advisory council, if directed to do so by the commission for higher education) to study methods to ensure opportunities for secondary school students to earn college credits while enrolled in high school and to provide incentives for a high school teacher to obtain a master's degree with at least eighteen (18) hours of graduate course work in the subject matter the teacher is teaching or wishes to teach as part of a dual credit course.
Title
Dual credit teachers. Requires the commission for higher education (or the dual credit advisory council, if directed to do so by the commission for higher education) to study methods to ensure opportunities for secondary school students to earn college credits while enrolled in high school and to provide incentives for a high school teacher to obtain a master's degree with at least eighteen (18) hours of graduate course work in the subject matter the teacher is teaching or wishes to teach as part of a dual credit course.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 26 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House - Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 26 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 175 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 381: yeas 84, nays 5 |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as second sponsor |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-01 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Kruse |
2016-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Amendment #2 (McNamara) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-28 | House | Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 84: yeas 26, nays 65 |
2016-01-28 | House | Amendment #4 (DeLaney) ruled out of order voice vote |
2016-01-28 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-26 | House | Representative Austin added as coauthor |
2016-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | Representative Cook added as coauthor |
2016-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |