IN SB0473 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 16 through 21 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - SECTIONS 16 through 21 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the general assembly to enact a statute to authorize : (1) imposing tolls as part of a public-private agreement, on an existing highway, or on I-69; or (2) constructing part of I-69. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2011, and ending June 30, 2021, legislative approval is not required to impose tolls on certain projects. Provides that a public- private agreement entered into after June 30, 2011, must contain certain provisions concerning methodologies used to fix user fees or tolls. Requires the budget committee to meet within 90 days and conduct a review of any project that includes tolls. Provides that the common construction wage applies to projects that are subjects of public-private agreements entered into after April 30, 2011. Provides that the owner of a motor vehicle that passes through a toll collection facility without paying the proper toll commits a moving violation, a Class C infraction. Establishes procedures for the collections of unpaid fines for these moving violations.
Title
Various transportation issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House - Amendment 79 (Soliday), prevailed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 71 (Austin), failed (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 7 (Reske), failed (Y: 35 N: 57 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 61 (Austin), failed (Y: 35 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Reske), failed (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 17 (Pierce), prevailed (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 47 (DeLaney), failed (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 56 (Tyler), prevailed (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 14 (Pierce), failed (Y: 38 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 54 (Crawford), failed (Y: 41 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Reske), failed (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 77 (Soliday), prevailed (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Roll Call 457: yeas 33, nays 56 (Y: 33 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House - Amendment 79 (Soliday), prevailed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 71 (Austin), failed (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 7 (Reske), failed (Y: 35 N: 57 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 61 (Austin), failed (Y: 35 N: 59 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Reske), failed (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 17 (Pierce), prevailed (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 47 (DeLaney), failed (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 56 (Tyler), prevailed (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 14 (Pierce), failed (Y: 38 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 54 (Crawford), failed (Y: 41 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Reske), failed (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Amendment 77 (Soliday), prevailed (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Roll Call 457: yeas 33, nays 56 (Y: 33 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | SECTIONS 16 through 21 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | SECTION 15 effective 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | SECTIONS 7 through 14 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | SECTION 6 effective 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | SECTIONS 1 through 5 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 163 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 491: yeas 31, nays 18 | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 702: yeas 61, nays 15 | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-25 | House advisors appointed: Davis, Morris, Austin and DeLaney | |
2011-04-25 | House conferees appointed: Soliday and Dobis | |
2011-04-25 | Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau, Banks, Bray and Hume | |
2011-04-25 | Senate conferees appointed: Wyss and Rogers | |
2011-04-25 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2011-04-25 | Concurrence withdrawn | |
2011-04-25 | Motion to concur in House amendments: call withdrawn | |
2011-04-15 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment 80 ( Soliday) and prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-15 | Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed; Roll Call 539: yeas 73, nays 19 | |
2011-04-14 | Amendment 79 (Soliday), prevailed; Roll Call 532: yeas 96, nays 0 | |
2011-04-14 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 71 (Austin), failed; Roll Call 504: yeas 37, nays 59 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 7 (Reske), failed; Roll Call 503: yeas 35, nays 57 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 61 (Austin), failed; Roll Call 502: yeas 35, nays 59 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 3 (Reske), failed; Roll Call 501: yeas 36, nays 62 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 17 (Pierce), prevailed; Roll Call 500: yeas 85, nays 14 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 5 (Reske), failed; voice vote | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 47 (DeLaney), failed; Roll Call 499: yeas 35, nays 60 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 56 (Tyler), prevailed; Roll Call 498: yeas 77, nays 20 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 14 (Pierce), failed; Roll Call 497: yeas 38, nays 60 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 72 (Rhoads), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 54 (Crawford), failed; Roll Call 496: yeas 41, nays 57 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 2 (Reske), failed; Roll Call 495: yeas 37, nays 59 | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 74 (Clere), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 78 (Soliday), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-13 | Amendment 77 (Soliday), prevailed; Roll Call 494: yeas 85, nays 12 | |
2011-04-13 | Second reading: amended, made special order of business for 1 :45pm 04/14/2011 | |
2011-04-08 | Representative Torr added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Roll Call 457: yeas 33, nays 56 | |
2011-04-08 | Minority report not substituted for majority report | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2011-02-22 | Cosponsor: Rep. Dobis | |
2011-02-22 | House sponsor: Rep. Soliday | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 240: yeas 37 and nays 12 | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-31 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2011-01-24 | Senator Charbonneau added as third author | |
2011-01-18 | Senator Banks added as coauthor | |
2011-01-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs | |
2011-01-13 | Authored by Senators Wyss and Rogers |