KS HB2023 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, March 30 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, March 30 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative review of exceptions to disclosure of public records.
Title
Legislative review of exceptions to disclosure of public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected - Yea: 6 Nay: 32 (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected - Yea: 30 Nay: 86 (Y: 30 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected - Yea: 6 Nay: 32 (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 0 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected - Yea: 30 Nay: 86 (Y: 30 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, March 30 , 2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected Yea: 6 Nay: 32 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 09, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected Yea: 30 Nay: 86 |
2015-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward |
2015-01-28 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2015-01-27 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2015-01-21 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 21, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112N |
2015-01-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-15 | House | House Introduced |