KS HB2286 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of transportation network company services.
Title
Regulation of transportation network company services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Insurance; Referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2015-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Friday, March 20, 2015, 11:00 AM Room 281-N |
2015-02-11 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2015-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-10 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2286/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2286_00_0000.pdf |