KS HB2416 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credit for certain purchases of goods and services by a taxpayer from qualified vendors that provide employment to individuals who are blind or severely disabled.
Title
Income tax credit for certain purchases of goods and services by a taxpayer from qualified vendors that provide employment to individuals who are blind or severely disabled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 21, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-03-07 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Mason was adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Mason |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2017-04-04 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, April 04, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-03-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-03-30 | House | House Introduced |