KS HB2575 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain records to be automatically expunged from a person's criminal record.
Title
Requiring certain records to be automatically expunged from a person's criminal record.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 7, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-01-31 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-31 | House | House Introduced |