KS HB2662 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for purchases of construction materials by a contractor for the Kansas fairgrounds foundation.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for purchases of construction materials by a contractor for the Kansas fairgrounds foundation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2024-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2024-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2024-02-01 | House | House Introduced |