KS HR6031 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 92-32)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Enrolled on Wednesday, May 11, 2011
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 92-32)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Enrolled on Wednesday, May 11, 2011
Summary
A RESOLUTION congratulating the Wichita State University Shockers for winning the 2011 National Invitation Tournament.
Title
A RESOLUTION congratulating the Wichita State University Shockers for winning the 2011 National Invitation Tournament.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Enrolled on Wednesday, May 11, 2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Adopted without roll call | |
2011-05-09 | Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/year1/measures/hr6031/ |