KY HB14 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-11 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-11 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.315 to exempt the estate of anyone who is eligible for state death gratuity benefits, and the estate of any regular member of the Armed Forces, from probate fees.
Title
AN ACT relating to probate fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Ron Crimm [R] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. Sannie Overly [D] |
Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. Ben Waide [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-11 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-09 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-08 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | |
2011-02-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 8, 2011 | |
2011-02-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-01-07 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House | |
2011-07-28 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB14.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB14/bill.doc |