KY HB365 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.999 to allow Kentucky residents under the age of 18 to prepay fines for certain traffic violations, if they are accompanied by a parent or a guardian; amend KRS 24A.175 to allow the court to adjudicate a traffic violation involving a defendant under the age of 18, if the defendant is accompanied by a parent or a guardian.
Title
AN ACT relating to the operation of a motor vehicle by persons under the age of 18.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-10 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB365.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB365/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB365/vote_history.pdf |