LA HB855 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for end-market uses of waste tires and waste tire material and repeals the Waste Tire Program Task Force.
Title
Provides for end-market uses of waste tires and waste tire material and repeals the Waste Tire Program Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 855 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1308) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 855 FINAL PASSAGE (#1168) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 855 FINAL PASSAGE (#374) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 855 FINAL PASSAGE (#1168) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 855 FINAL PASSAGE (#374) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/18. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |