LA HB934 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the dedication of revenue from carbon dioxide sequestration on state lands and water bottoms
Title
Provides for the dedication of revenue from carbon dioxide sequestration on state lands and water bottoms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 934 FINAL PASSAGE (#513) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |