LA HCR86 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a study committee on family caregiving and long-term supports
Title
Creates a study committee on family caregiving and long-term supports
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Simon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 86 ADOPT (#1057) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1056) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#720) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 86 ADOPT (#599) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#320) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1056) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#720) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 86 ADOPT (#599) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#320) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-10 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-10 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2015-06-08 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Heitmeier, Erdey, and Broome. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Simon, Hoffmann, and Pope. |
2015-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015. |
2015-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (18-0). |
2015-04-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-04-28 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |