LA HCR86 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Bradley Spicer for 55 years of public service and congratulates him upon his retirement
Title
Commends Bradley Spicer for 55 years of public service and congratulates him upon his retirement
Sponsors
Rep. John Anders [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 86 ADOPT (#383) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 03 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |