LA HCR86 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the La. State Law Institute to study the adoption of the Uniform Partition of Heirs' Property Act
Title
Directs the La. State Law Institute to study the adoption of the Uniform Partition of Heirs' Property Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 86 CONCUR (#1011) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#715) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#715) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-06-08 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/09/2021. |
2021-06-08 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (13-0-1). |
2021-05-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |