LA SB234 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - By a vote of 52 yeas, 35 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - By a vote of 52 yeas, 35 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to allow adult prosecution and enhanced penalties against juveniles in correctional facilities who commit assault or battery against an employee or juvenile. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE1 DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment to allow adult prosecution and enhanced penalties against juveniles in correctional facilities who commit assault or battery against an employee or juvenile. (2/3 - CA13s1(A)) (RE1 DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 234 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#1713) (Y: 52 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 234 2/3 vote (#1384) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 234 FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 234 2/3 vote (#1384) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 234 FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | By a vote of 52 yeas, 35 nays, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House refused to approve consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-05 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-05-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |