LA SB269 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Effective date 7/5/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Effective date 7/5/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Louisiana Housing Corporation. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Louisiana Housing Corporation. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on SB 269, MOTION TO ADOPT (#945) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 269, ADOPT (#1021) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 269, REJECT (#905) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 269, FINAL PASSAGE (#764) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 269, FINAL PASSAGE (#385) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 269, ADOPT (#1021) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 269, REJECT (#905) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - House - House Vote on SB 269, FINAL PASSAGE (#764) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 269, FINAL PASSAGE (#385) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-05 | Effective date 7/5/11. | |
2011-07-05 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 408. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the Speaker of the House on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2011-06-22 | House conferees appointed: Tucker, Barrow, and Nowlin. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2011-06-21 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Chaisson, Riser, and Jackson, L.. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending. | |
2011-06-21 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-20 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-16 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2011-06-07 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-06-06 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-06 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-01 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-05-31 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-26 | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 249. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |