MA H1528 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the indemnification of certain persons from civil proceedings for injuries or deaths of persons unlawfully entering their dwelling. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to civil liability for protecting one’s home
Sponsors
Rep. David Muradian [R] | Rep. William Crocker [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Norman Orrall [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H904 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1552 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3369 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S627 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1552 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1394 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3369 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S627 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1528 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1528.pdf |