MA H1661 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Markey of Dartmouth, a petition of Christopher M. Markey for an investigation by special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the legal and regulatory framework governing the bail system. The Judiciary.
Title
Resolve establishing a bail reform and pretrial treatment task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H568 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2659
H4088 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Reporting date extended to Friday May 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4444 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4088 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Reporting date extended to Friday May 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4444 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1661 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1661.pdf |